King, David Edmund Lascelles (CPSO#: 21553)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011