King, George Wilson (CPSO#: 68536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1400 Cameron st
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3T1
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-5656
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

suite 300
1 Raymond St
Ottawa ON  K1R 1A2
Canada
Phone: (613) 235-3636
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George W. King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. King ( CPSO# 68536 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
1400 Cameron Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3T1
Phone Number: (613) 632-5656

Business Address:
300 - 1 Raymond Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 235-3636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE WILSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 1999 to 03 Jan 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1999