King, Graham John Winsor (CPSO#: 54431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hand And Upper Limb Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6011
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham J W King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. King ( CPSO# 54431 )

Business Address:
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM JOHN WINSOR KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992