King, John William Roy (CPSO#: 55612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ROY KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1986