King, Lauren Karina (CPSO#: 100329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Unviersity of Toronto
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-586-4800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN KARINA KING shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KING is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KING shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KING is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KING shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KING is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KING no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018