King, Rebekah May (CPSO#: 88520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Near North Medical Clinic
Suite 201
66 Josephine St
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 495-2685
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Drive
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebekah King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. King ( CPSO# 88520 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 495-2685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBEKAH MAY KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011