King, Robert Joseph (CPSO#: 53832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 15
176 Lakeshore Drive
North Bay ON  P1A 2A9
Phone: 705 478 9981
Fax: 705 478 6468
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KACL Ninth Avenue South
Kenora ON  P9N 2H8
Canada
Phone: (807) 467-5257
Fax: (807) 467-5264
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007


Corporation Name: Robert J. King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. King ( CPSO# 53832 )

Business Address:
176 Lakeshore Drive
Suite 15
North Bay ON  P1A 2A9
Phone Number: (705) 478-9981

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1988