King, Susan Margaret (CPSO#: 52713)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Aug 1988
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2005