King, William James Bruce (CPSO#: 55931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Medicine
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. James King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. King ( CPSO# 55931 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Pediatric Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES BRUCE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1989