Kingdom, John Charles Peter (CPSO#: 72096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
600 University Avenue
3rd Floor, Room 3-904, OPG Building
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8808 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 586-3216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingdom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joyce ( CPSO# 76556 )
Dr. J. Kingdom ( CPSO# 72096 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
700 University Avenue
Suite 3-904
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8808

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES PETER KINGDOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGDOM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2003