Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kingston, Susan Janet (CPSO#: 67419)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2005