Kingstone, Eddie (CPSO#: 22603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 602
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 967-6200
Fax: (416) 967-6201
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            The following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
            of registration held by Dr. Eddie Kingstone, by Order by the Discipline
            Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario on April 24,
            2006, and by subsequent Orders of the Discipline Committee on August 2, 2012
            and February 10, 2016 to vary the terms, conditions and limitations:

            2.    (i)   Dr. Kingstone is permanently prohibited from prescribing narcotics.
                        For greater certainty, this includes "verbal prescription
                        narcotics" as defined in the Controlled Drugs and Substances
                        Regulations.

                  (ii)  That Dr. Kingstone shall keep a copy of all prescriptions for
                        controlled drugs and substances including benzodiazepines in each
                        patient chart. In addition, Dr. Kingstone shall keep a log of all
                        prescriptions for controlled drugs and substances, including
                        benzodiazepines.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 2006
Summary:

On August 2, 2012, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Kingstone, ordered and 
 directed that 2(ii) of the June 5, 2006 Order shall be varied, to read as follows:  

       2(ii) That Dr. Kingstone shall keep a copy of all prescriptions for controlled drugs and 
      substances including benzodiazepines in each patient chart. In addition, Dr. Kingstone 
      shall keep a log of all prescriptions for controlled drugs and substances, including 
      benzodiazepines.  

The Committee further ordered and directed that 2(iii) of the 2006 Order shall be varied, to read 
as follows:  

       2(iii) That Dr. Kingstone shall be required to practice under the supervision of a clinical 
      supervisor acceptable to the College, who has signed the undertaking attached as 
      Appendix 2 to the June 5, 2006 Order. The supervision shall include that Dr. Kingstone is 
      required to meet with the supervisor once monthly at which time the supervisor will 
      review a representative sample of Dr. Kingstone’s patient charts (to be chosen by the 
      supervisor), and discuss them with Dr. Kingstone. Dr. Kingstone is required to follow 
      any recommendations of the clinical supervisor. The supervisor shall submit reports to 
       the College as outlined in the Undertaking.  

 Dr. Kingstone will still be prohibited from prescribing narcotics. He will meet with a clinical 
 supervisor monthly. Copies of all prescriptions for controlled substances, including 
 benzodiazepines, will be kept in patient charts and a log of all such prescriptions will be kept. 

 On February 18, 2016, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Kingstone, made an 
 Order to vary the June 5, 2006 Order of the Discipline Committee (as varied by the August 2, 
 2012 Order of the Discipline Committee). 

 Specifically, the Discipline Committee ordered that the 2006 Order, as varied by the 2012 Order, 
 shall be further varied effective February 10, 2016: (1) to eliminate the supervision requirement 
 contained in paragraph 2(iii) thereof; and (2) to eliminate the requirement for a reassessment 
 pursuant to paragraph 2(iv) of the said Order, and to eliminate the requirement to pay the 
 expenses of such supervision and reassessment pursuant to paragraph 2(v) of the said Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 24, 2006