Kinigakis, Tracey Dawn (CPSO#: 52034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Names: Quart, Tracey Dawn (used until: 23 Jan 2003 )     Ullerick, Tracey Dawn (used until: 10 Jan 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 642-2077
Fax: (519) 642-1725
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACEY DAWN KINIGAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINIGAKIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1983