Kinsella, Patrick Laurence (CPSO#: 25919)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Apr 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1999