Kintu, Andrew (CPSO#: 100074)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Makerere Univ, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Apr 2013 to 15 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 16 May 2013 to 25 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2013