Kintzen, George Michael (CPSO#: 54791)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003