Kiraly, Istvan Deszo (CPSO#: 24701)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1971 to 15 Jun 1972
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008