Kirby, Christopher Erle (CPSO#: 91480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: 613 258-6133 Ext. 768
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St. Laurent Blvd.
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Almonte General Hospital
46 Spring st.
Almonte ON  K0A1A0
Canada
Phone: 613 256-5671
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring St
Almonte ON  K0A1A0
Canada
Phone: 613 256-2514 Ext. 2270
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial Hospit
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: 613-774-2420 Ext. 6820
Fax: 613-774-0453
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Lady Dunn Health Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 856-1313
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doobay Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doobay ( CPSO# 84875 )
Dr. C. Kirby ( CPSO# 91480 )

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
P.O. Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3435

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2514

Business Address:
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0

Business Address:
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ERLE KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2012