Kirby, Erle John (CPSO#: 27871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone: (705) 856-1313
Fax: (705) 856-9550
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERLE JOHN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985