Kirby, Joanne Naomi (CPSO#: 62534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rm B2-450
800 Commissioners Rd. E.
Box 5010
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8394
Fax: (519) 685-8024
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Akira Sugimoto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sugimoto ( CPSO# 62115 )
Dr. J. Kirby ( CPSO# 62534 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8088


Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kirby ( CPSO# 62534 )

Business Address:
Suite B2-450
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE NAOMI KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991