Kirby, John Gerard (CPSO#: 53151)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage and Retrieval Services 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 www.getmymedrecords.ca
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017