Kirby, Melanie-Ann (CPSO#: 54622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7606
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE-ANN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992