Kirby, Simon David (CPSO#: 66785)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011