Kirby, Thomas James (CPSO#: 31160)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009