Kirigin, Mladen Jacob (CPSO#: 59855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 949-8888
Fax: (905) 949-9111
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. J. Kirigin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kirigin ( CPSO# 59855 )

Business Address:
170 Queensway West
Suite 203
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 949-8888

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Trillium Health Partners
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
100 Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MLADEN JACOB KIRIGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRIGIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989