Kirk, Mary Ellen (CPSO#: 31090)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007