Kirkbride, Peter (CPSO#: 62949)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001