Kirkham, Julia Grace (CPSO#: 99985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care
Mental Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53503
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Kirkham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kirkham ( CPSO# 99985 )

Business Address:
Providence Care
Mental Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA GRACE KIRKHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRKHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014