Kirkland, James Leslie (CPSO#: 33498)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995