Kirpalani, Haresh Murli (CPSO#: 52232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Philadelphia
34Th Street And Civic
Center Boulevard
Philadelphia PA  19104-4318
United States
Phone: (215) 590-2455

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARESH MURLI KIRPALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRPALANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1983