Kirsch, Richard (CPSO#: 83059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Lab Medicine & Pathobiology
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6187
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Richard Kirsch may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology,
            only.