Kirsh, Joel Alan (CPSO#: 65308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: 647-329-1826
Fax: 6473292013
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL ALAN KIRSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993