Kirsh, Joel Colin (CPSO#: 25069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 416-578-7822
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Diagnostic Centres
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON M8Z 5W4
Etobicoke ON  L4Y 4G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 621-3961
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ontario Diagnostic Centres
1370 Dundas St E. Suite 302
Mississauga ON
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-3369
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL COLIN KIRSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1976