Kirshen, Albert Jacob (CPSO#: 30865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative
Care Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7885
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. J. Kirshen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kirshen ( CPSO# 30865 )

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
60 Murray Street
L4 000 Box 13
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT JACOB KIRSHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979