Kirshen, Carly Allison (CPSO#: 88521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elizabeth Bruyere
Dermatology Clinics
Unit 214Y
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6354
Fax: (613) 562-6022
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 470
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carly Kirshen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014


Corporation Name: Carly Kirshen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kirshen ( CPSO# 88521 )

Business Address:
214Y - 43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8

Business Address:
737 Parkdale Avenue
Suite 470
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLY ALLISON KIRSHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013