Kirshner, Caroline Dok (CPSO#: 56794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 740
Toronto ON  M4R 2G4
Phone: (416) 964-2540
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE DOK KIRSHNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSHNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 10 Oct 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987