Kirtsman, Maksim (CPSO#: 95314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Department of Pediatrics
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Div Neonatal Perinatal Medicine
Department of Pediarics
600 University Avenue, 19th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 8297
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
15th Floor Cardinal Carter South
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 6560
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAKSIM KIRTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRTSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014