Kiruluta, Hormisdas George (CPSO#: 45245)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 22 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2001