Kiruluta, Sheila Mae (CPSO#: 30245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
800 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E4
Phone: (613) 546-6047
Fax: (613) 542-9712
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Out Patient Clinic
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Pathways for Children and Youth
31 Hyperion Court
Suite # 101
Kingston ON  K7K 7G3
Canada
Phone: (613) 546-8535
Fax: 613-546-3881
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Kiruluta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kiruluta ( CPSO# 30245 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
201 - 800 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E4
Phone Number: (613) 546-6047

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
101 - 31 Hyperion Court
Kingston ON  K7K 5X4
Phone Number: (613) 546-8535

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA MAE KIRULUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRULUTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1992