Kirwin, Pierre Joseph (CPSO#: 56903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakdale Professional Medical Centre
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 402
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-2314
Fax: (416) 745-9336
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Kirwin, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kirwin ( CPSO# 56903 )

Business Address:
Oakdale Professional Medical Centre
402 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-2314

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE JOSEPH KIRWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1987