Kischuk, Robert Paul (CPSO#: 57287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8120
Fax: (905) 468-8570
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kischuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kischuk ( CPSO# 57287 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 520-1254

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL KISCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988