Kishinevsky, Elena (CPSO#: 83368)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Siberian State Medical Academy, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 08 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006