Kiss, Thomas Laszlo (CPSO#: 65776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian

Education:University of Basel, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maisonneuve Rosemont Hospital
5415 Boulevard l'Assomption
Montreal QC  H1T 2M4
Phone: (514) 252-3404
Fax: (514) 254-5094

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 15 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS LASZLO KISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1996