Kiss, Zelma (CPSO#: 59590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Foothills Hospital
1403 29th Street NW
Calgary AB  T2N2T9
Phone: (403) 944-8602
Fax: (403) 283-2270

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZELMA KISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990