Kitai, Ian Colin (CPSO#: 57633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 202
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-7593
Fax: (905) 683-7669
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Infectious Diseases
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 204649
Fax: (416) 813-5032
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Wilcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wilcock ( CPSO# 61570 )
Dr. I. Kitai ( CPSO# 57633 )

Business Address:
309 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 289-0519


Corporation Name: Ian Kitai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wilcock ( CPSO# 61570 )
Dr. I. Kitai ( CPSO# 57633 )

Business Address:
202 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-7593

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN COLIN KITAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989