Kitakufe, John Justin Chrozy (CPSO#: 26157)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ganda, Soga, Swahili

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Sharon Kour email: skour@mccarthy.ca
Date Received: 07 Apr 2010


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Ms. Stella Sight Unit 516 1280 Finch Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M3J 3K6
Date Received: 09 Jan 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 01 May 2008
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 03 Sep 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Feb 2010
Summary:

      The Committee accepted as true all of the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts save 
that the Committee noted that the transcript of the guilty plea indicates this proceeding was on August 
29 and not August 28, 2007. Having regard to these facts, the Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe’s 
admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found 
guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and that he has committed an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  

      1. Dr. Kitakufe appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded. 

      2. The Registrar revoke Dr. Kitakufe’s certificate of registration effective immediately. 

The Committee further orders that Dr. Kitakufe shall pay to the College its costs fixed at $18,250.00 
within six (6) months of the date of this order.  

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 8-12, March 3, 2010


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 12, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his 
 suitability to practise by another jurisdiction (United States District Court, Northern District 
 of Illinois.)

In accordance with the Consent Disposition, the Discipline Committee Ordered:

1) 
 	that Dr. Kitakufe(s certificate of registration be suspended for six-months; the six-	months 
 having been served from October 1, 1999, to April 1, 2000;
2) 	the Registrar is directed to impose 
 terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Kitakufe(s                   certificate of registration 
 that he may continue to practise only if and as long as he:

(A) permits the College to monitor 
 his accounts to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan  	       approximately annually;
(B) authorizes 
 the College to obtain information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan 	      about his billings 
 to the Plan; 
(C) pays the expenses of the monitoring in an amount not to exceed $3,500 per year 	 
      within  60 days of being billed for the expenses for a period of five years from the          
                  date of the Order.
3) 	recorded reprimand;
4) 	costs, in the amount of $3,750 to 
 be paid to the College by March 30, 2001.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 12, 2001