Kitching, Allan Donald (CPSO#: 59355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Charlton Medical Centre
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 500
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 528-4111
Fax: (905) 528-9181
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Westmount Community Health Centre
Specialty Clinic
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2N9
Canada
Phone: (905) 318-2977
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Cardiology Program - OP Clinic
50 Charlton Avenue East
HAMILTON, ON, L8N 4A6
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1144
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan D. Kitching Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kitching ( CPSO# 59355 )

Business Address:
Charlton Medical Centre
500 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN DONALD KITCHING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITCHING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1989