Kitts, John Bryson (CPSO#: 32710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BRYSON KITTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITTS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987