Kivinen, Gary William (CPSO#: 27232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Kivinen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Tel: 705 560 8461 Fax: 705 524 8012
Date Received: 23 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014