Kizior-Hajduk, Anna Jadwiga (CPSO#: 80633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: Hajduk, Anna Jadwiga Kizior (used until: 14 Sep 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone: (519) 823-5133
Fax: (519) 827-0255
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kizior-Hajduk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kizior-Hajduk ( CPSO# 80633 )

Business Address:
Arbour Medical Centre
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-5133

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA JADWIGA KIZIOR-HAJDUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIZIOR-HAJDUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 10 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004